This dataset includes 3.55 million business entities (corporations, LLCs, etc.) registered with California Secretary of State. Each business is registered with business name, principal address, mailing address, owner name, owner address, entity status, type and creation date.
Entity Name | Office Address | CEO/Agent | Incorporation |
---|---|---|---|
Howden Construction Services Inc. | 2475 George Urban Boulevard, Suite 120, Depew, NY 14043 | DARRYL CLIFFORD HALTER | 2016-04-20 |
The Skm Group, Inc. | 6350 Transit Rd, Depew, NY 14043 | SUSAN MEANY | 2010-04-20 |
Howden North America Inc. | 2475 George Urban Boulevard, Suite 120, Depew, NY 14043 | P. MARK SANDERS | 2008-04-02 |
Reichert, Inc. | 3362 Walden Avenue, Depew, NY 14043 | BRUCE P. WILSON | 2006-07-06 |
Pcb Piezotronics, Inc. | 3425 Walden Ave, Depew, NY 14043 | JEFFREY GRAVES | 2004-03-17 |
Stampede Presentation Products, Inc. | 3332 Walden Ave Ste 106, Depew, NY 14043 | MARK WILKINS | 2003-03-18 |
Sefar Printing Solutions Inc. | 111 Calumet St, Depew, NY 14043 | DAVID S KOEBCKE | 1999-07-29 |
First Performance Mortgage Corporation | 2929 Walde Ave, Depew, NY 14047 | DAVID J HUNTER | 1994-05-20 |
Desu Machinery Corporation | Po Box 245, Depew, NY 14043 | MARTIN W GOLDEN II | 1990-09-26 |
Valley Medical Management, Inc. | 4721 Transit Rd, Depew, NY 14043 | MARK COX | 1989-11-16 |
Santo International, Inc. Which Will Do Business In California As Santo Tours | 6216 Transit Rd, Depew, NY 14043 | ** RESIGNED ON 10/30/1989 | 1985-08-19 |
Seneca Balance, Inc. | 27 Hyland Rd, Depew, NY 14043 | THE PRENTICE-HALL CORPORATION SYSTEM, INC. | 1985-06-14 |
Elmar Industries, Inc. | P.o. Box 245, Depew, NY 14043 | MARTIN W. GOLDEN 2ND | 1980-07-25 |
Dealer Service Center, Inc. | 5939 Transit Rd, Depew, NY 14043 | RUSSEL E COOKMAN | 1979-04-17 |
Sefar Inc. | 111 Calumet Street, Depew, NY 14043 | DAVID S KOEBCKE | 1974-04-15 |
Tifs, Inc. | 2929 Walden Ave, Depew, NY 14043 | 1968-04-09 |