WILLIAM D HURLEY (Credential# 224168) is licensed (Architect) with Connecticut Department of Consumer Protection. The license effective date is August 1, 2019. The license expiration date date is July 31, 2020. The license status is ACTIVE.
WILLIAM D HURLEY is licensed with the Department of Consumer Protection of Connecticut. The credential number is #ARI.0009507. The credential type is architect. The effective date is August 1, 2019. The expiration date is July 31, 2020. The business address is Po Box 2076, Rogers, AR 72757-2076. The current status is active.
Licensee Name | WILLIAM D HURLEY |
Doing Business As | PB II ARCHITECTURE & ENGINEERING |
Credential ID | 224168 |
Credential Number | ARI.0009507 |
Credential Type | ARCHITECT |
Business Address |
Po Box 2076 Rogers AR 72757-2076 |
Business Type | INDIVIDUAL |
Status | ACTIVE - CURRENT |
Active | 1 |
Effective Date | 2019-08-01 |
Expiration Date | 2020-07-31 |
Refresh Date | 2019-07-15 |
ID | Credential Code | Credential Type | Issue | Term | Status |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
907454 | 70 | Emergency Medical Technician | - | EXPIRED APPLICATION | |
907453 | 70 | Emergency Medical Technician | - | PENDING |
Street Address | PO Box 2076 |
City | ROGERS |
State | AR |
Zip Code | 72757-2076 |
Licensee Name | Office Address | Credential | Effective / Expiration |
---|---|---|---|
Keith A Williams | Po Box 2076, Rogers, AR 72757 | Professional Engineer | 2020-02-01 ~ 2021-01-31 |
Pankaj Neupane | Po Box 2076, Rogers, AR 72757-2076 | Professional Engineer | 2020-02-01 ~ 2021-01-31 |
Joshua D Mccall | Po Box 2076, Rogers, AR 72757-2076 | Professional Engineer | 2020-02-01 ~ 2021-01-31 |
Licensee Name | Office Address | Credential | Effective / Expiration |
---|---|---|---|
Richard M Welcher | P.o. Box 756, Rogers, AR 72757 | Professional Engineer | 2020-03-11 ~ 2021-01-31 |
Danny E Doss | P O Box 427, Rogers, AR 72757 | Professional Engineer | 2020-02-01 ~ 2021-01-31 |
Perry L Butcher | 301 W Chestnut St, Rogers, AR 72757 | Architect | 2003-08-01 ~ 2004-07-31 |
First Nature Inc | Po Box 220, Rogers, AR 72757-0220 | Commercial Feed | 2020-03-11 ~ 2020-12-31 |
Mark A Smith | Po Box 756, Rogers, AR 72757-0756 | Professional Engineer | 2013-02-01 ~ 2014-01-31 |
Licensee Name | Office Address | Credential | Effective / Expiration |
---|---|---|---|
Kevin Lee Cooper | 316 South 1st Street, Rogers, AR 72756 | Architect | 2020-08-01 ~ 2021-07-31 |
Tatum Smith Welcher Engineers Inc | 3100 S. Market Street, Suite 202, Rogers, AR 72758 | Professional Engineering Corporation | 2020-07-13 ~ 2021-07-12 |
Melissa A Guerrero | 144 B State Ave, Rogers, CT 06263 | Casino Class I Employee | 2019-12-03 ~ 2020-02-28 |
Archway Marketing Services Inc | 20000 S Diamond Lake Rd, Rogers, MN 55374-4735 | Wholesaler of Drugs, Cosmetics & Medical Devices | 2020-04-16 ~ 2021-06-30 |
Archway Marketing Services Inc | 19850 S Diamond Lake Rd, Rogers, MN 55374-4571 | Wholesaler of Drugs, Cosmetics & Medical Devices | 2020-04-16 ~ 2021-06-30 |
Brittany L Pearce | Po Box 352, Rogers, CT 06263-0352 | Hairdresser/cosmetician | 2020-04-01 ~ 2022-03-31 |
Wendy M Briere · Lalumiere | P.o. Box 367, Rogers, CT 06263 | Hairdresser/cosmetician | 2020-03-01 ~ 2022-02-28 |
Laura L Carmical | 3821 Dixieland Rd, Rogers, AR 72756-7005 | Dietitian/nutritionist | 2020-04-01 ~ 2021-03-31 |
Timothy M Moynihan | 145 State Ave, Rogers, CT 06263 | Casino Class I Employee | 2019-12-11 ~ 2020-10-31 |
Elizabeth Swain | 21 Boys Ave #389, Rogers, CT 06263 | Medication Administration Certification | ~ |
Find all Licenses in ROGERS |
City | ROGERS |
Zip Code | 72757 |
License Type | ARCHITECT |
License Type + County | ARCHITECT + ROGERS |
Licensee Name | Office Address | Credential | Effective / Expiration |
---|---|---|---|
Cynthia Hurley · Cynthia Hurley French Wines | 25 Lockwood Rd, West Newton, MA 02465-2413 | Out of State Shipper Liquor | 2018-09-07 ~ 2019-09-06 |
Matthew T Hurley · Hurley Roofing & Restoration | 22 Hillcrest Ave, Naugatuck, CT 06770 | Home Improvement Contractor | 2000-03-17 ~ 2000-11-30 |
J Dwight Hetherington | 338 Overlook Dr, Hurley, NY 12443 | Architect | ~ |
James P Sperry | 305 Hurley Avenue, Kingston, NY 12401 | Landscape Architect | 2018-09-30 ~ 2019-07-31 |
Thomas Hurley · Hurley's Construction | 90 Monroe St, East Hartford, CT 06118-2322 | Home Improvement Contractor | 2019-12-01 ~ 2020-11-30 |
William S Hurley | 12 Fairchild Drive, Newtown, CT 06470 | Professional Engineer | 2020-02-01 ~ 2021-01-31 |
William Hurley | 92 Raymond Dr, Seekonk, MA 02771 | Electrical Limited Journeyperson | 1995-10-01 ~ 1996-09-30 |
William E Hurley | 190 Berlin Ave, Southington, CT 06489-3222 | Home Improvement Salesperson | 2012-12-01 ~ 2013-11-30 |
William H Hurley | 201 Natchaug Drive, Glastonbury, CT 06033 | Registered Nurse | 1992-04-24 ~ 1993-03-31 |
William Sharp Architect P.C. | 1200 Summer St Ste 103, Stamford, CT 06905 | Architecture Corporation | 2002-08-27 ~ 2003-07-31 |
Please comment or provide details below to improve the information on WILLIAM D HURLEY.
Data Provider | Connecticut Department of Consumer Protection |
Jurisdiction | Connecticut |
Related Datasets | Connecticut Business Registrations, Connecticut Child Care Facilities |
This dataset includes 1.41 million licenses issued wtih Connecticut Department of Consumer Protection (TDLR).